Selliah, Prasanna Selvaranee (CPSO#: 65478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
2120 Northpark Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 799-9815
Fax: (905) 799-5950
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Selliah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Selliah ( CPSO# 65478 )

Business Address:
2120 Northpark Drive
Suite 202
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 799-9815

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRASANNA SELVARANEE SELLIAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELLIAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993