Sempowski, Ian Peter (CPSO#: 60763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens Family Health Team
115 Clarence Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5N6
Phone: (613) 533-9303
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sempowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sempowski ( CPSO# 60763 )

Business Address:
Haynes Hall Family Health Team
115 Clarence Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN PETER SEMPOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEMPOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1991