Sen Gupta, Sandip Kumar (CPSO#: 53047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Pathology
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4164
Fax: (613) 548-6076
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Perth & Smith Falls District
Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandip K. SenGupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sen Gupta ( CPSO# 53047 )

Business Address:
Department of Pathology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Suite 8-211
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 14 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDIP KUMAR SEN GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEN GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1987