Sen, Mithu (CPSO#: 72467)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital Room D2 521
Critical Care Trauma Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6577
Fax: (519) 685-8649
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mithu Sen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sen ( CPSO# 72467 )

Business Address:
LHSC-Victoria Hospital
Room D2 521
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 27 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITHU SEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1999