Sen, Roger Indraraj (CPSO#: 63880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite C9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H6
Phone: (905) 303-2700
Fax: (905) 303-2780
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roger Sen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 30 2011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jan 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROGER INDRARAJ SEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992