Senthelal, Sentheshanmuganathan (CPSO#: 64433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:Taskent Medical Institute, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5000
Fax: (905) 813-3962
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Senti Senthelal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Senthelal ( CPSO# 64433 )

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4110

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 27 May 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SENTHESHANMUGANATHAN SENTHELAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENTHELAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jul 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 30 Mar 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
Other - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 May 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2004