Sessford, Brandy (CPSO#: 100034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Moran, Brandy (used until: 19 May 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
Department of Medical Imaging
265 Dundas Street
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613)9697400
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brandy Sessford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sessford ( CPSO# 100034)

Business Address:
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 3X3

Business Address:
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5

Business Address:
Quinte Health Centre
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANDY SESSFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SESSFORD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 05 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015