Seybold, Heather Elizabeth (CPSO#: 32413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: Chamberlain, Heather Elizabeth Seybold (used until: 07 Aug 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Elizabeth Seybold Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Seybold ( CPSO# 32413 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH SEYBOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEYBOLD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1981