Shachar, Orli Michelle (CPSO#: 97816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6060 Ext. 13
Fax: (416) 323-6351
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Breast Centre, 2nd floor
610 University Avenue, Toronto
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-2297 Ext. 2
Fax: (416) 946-2370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ORLI MICHELLE SHACHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHACHAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014