Shah, Amit Pravin (CPSO#: 67883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
P O Box 2007
St Thomas ON  N5P 3W2
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 77576
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amit Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shah ( CPSO# 67883 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
Emergency Department
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020


Corporation Name: P.C. Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 19 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIT PRAVIN SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996