Shah, Jyotsna Prakeshkumar (CPSO#: 76006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2015

Expiry Date:  31 May 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Gujarat University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Suite 19 - 231
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8435
Fax: (416) 586 8745
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shah ( CPSO# 76006 )
Dr. P. Shah ( CPSO# 73197 )

Business Address:
Department of Paediatrics
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue Suite 19-231P
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4761

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jun 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 May 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Jyotsna Prakeshkumar Shah may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, Division of Neonatology, University of Toronto, in
                        which Dr. Shah holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Shah  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Shah's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Shah's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 1, 2015.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on May 31, 2022.