Shah, Vibhuti Shantilal (CPSO#: 70622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Seth G. S. Medical College, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatrics
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 19-231N
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4816
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Shah ( CPSO# 70622 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Room 19-231N
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4816

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIBHUTI SHANTILAL SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jan 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2005