Shahbazi, Nasim (CPSO#: 85098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 345-7170
Fax: (807) 345-5888
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nasim Shahbazi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shahbazi ( CPSO# 85098 )

Business Address:
405 - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 345-7170

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASIM SHAHBAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHBAZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010