Shahid, Shaneela (CPSO#: 86930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ziauddin Medical University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Center
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-3437
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 120 & 121
330 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Canada
Phone: (905) 693-1314
Fax: (905) 693-8892
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
327 Reynold Street
Oakville ON  L6J 3L7
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shaneela Shahid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shahid ( CPSO# 86930 )

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 336-9607

Business Address:
330 Bronte Street South
Suites 120 & 121
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Phone Number: (905) 693-1314

Business Address:
2nd Floor
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 336-3437

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANEELA SHAHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011