Shams, Eriny (CPSO#: 101964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ross University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1880 Eglinton Ave east
Toronto ON  M1L 2L1
Phone: (416) 285-7575
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Shams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shams ( CPSO# 101964)

Business Address:
1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 285-7575

Business Address:
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 3N4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Sep 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERINY SHAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2013