Shamsie, Amina Jacqueline (CPSO#: 63798)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Ottawa Medical Centre
Unit 2
1650 Queensdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1T 1N8
Phone: (613) 244-4400
Fax: (613) 244-3399
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shamsie-Macmillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shamsie ( CPSO# 63798 )
Dr. D. Macmillan ( CPSO# 63909 )

Business Address:
Suite 35B
2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 761-6777

Business Address:
South Ottawa Medical Centre
2 - 1650 Queensdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1T 1N8
Phone Number: (613) 244-4400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMINA JACQUELINE SHAMSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMSIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1992