Shanmugathasan, Sulochana (CPSO#: 102247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Queensland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pickering Urgent Care
1450 kingston road
Pickering ON  L1V 1C1
Phone: (905) 831-8333
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1101 kingston road unit 6
Glendale walkin clinic
Pickering ON  L1V 1B6
Canada
Phone: 9058319797
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SULOCHANA SHANMUGATHASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANMUGATHASAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Nov 2013 to 04 Dec 2013
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2013 to 02 Jan 2014
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2014