Shapero, Jonathan (CPSO#: 91743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 745-3344
Fax: (416) 745-3205
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harvey Shapero Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shapero ( CPSO# 91743 )
Dr. H. Shapero ( CPSO# 21520 )

Business Address:
300 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 745-3344


Corporation Name: Jonathan Shapero Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shapero ( CPSO# 91743 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 745-1091

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN SHAPERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPERO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011