Shapiro, Joanna Louise (CPSO#: 70403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 1P1
Phone: (416) 743-5853
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Varkul and Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Varkul ( CPSO# 69255 )
Dr. J. Shapiro ( CPSO# 70403 )

Business Address:
100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 746-1011

Business Address:
Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 1P1
Phone Number: (416) 743-5853

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA LOUISE SHAPIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998