Sharkawy, Abdul Quadir Ahmed (CPSO#: 72661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medicine
8th Floor East Wing Room 418
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2587
Fax: (416) 603-6495
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A A Sharkawy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sharkawy ( CPSO# 72661 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
8th Floor, East Wing, Room 418
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDUL QUADIR AHMED SHARKAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARKAWY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2002 to 27 Jun 2002
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2004