Sharma, Om Prakash (CPSO#: 85818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nagpur University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1027 Washington AVE
Detroit Lakes MN  56501
United States
Phone: 2188442300
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Om Prakash Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Illinois
USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OM PRAKASH SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 09 Feb 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2011