Sharma, Sanjeev (CPSO#: 71590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: (416) 969-3268
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2338 Hurontario Street, Suite 202
Mississauga ON  L5B1N1
Canada
Phone: 9052327002
Fax: 9052327005
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

374 Lakeshore Rd. East
Mississauga ON  L5G 1H5
Canada
Phone: 905-271-9000
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjeev Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 71590 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
2338 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N1

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Qeensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJEEV SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 12 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008