Sharma, Susan Marie (CPSO#: 69287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's Student Health
La Salle Building
146 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2506
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Urgent Care Centre
Cataraqui Town Centre
945 Gardiners Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Canada
Phone: (613) 389-3348
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARIE SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1997