Sharobim, Nazar Roger (CPSO#: 77156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Harwood Medical Centre
Unit 2
320 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J1
Phone: (905) 231-1122
Fax: (905) 231-1124
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ajax and Pickering General Hospital
Site. Lakeridge Health Corporation
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 1210
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nazar Sharobim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sharobim ( CPSO# 77156 )

Business Address:
Harwood Medical Centre
Unit 2
320 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J1
Phone Number: (905) 231-1122

Business Address:
Ajax and Pickering General Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAZAR ROGER SHAROBIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAROBIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2001