Shastry, Anil Keith (CPSO#: 81128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anil Shastry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shastry ( CPSO# 81128 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIL KEITH SHASTRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHASTRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009