Shcherbatykh, Julia Aleksandrovna (CPSO#: 93327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Voronez State Medical Academy, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Charing Cross Medical
124 Charing Cross Street
Brantford ON  N3R 2J1
Phone: (519)304-8550
Fax: (519)304-8554
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

81 Wilson Street West Unit 303
Ancaster ON  L9G1N1
Canada
Phone: (289) 239-8537
Fax: (866) 920-2702
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shcherbatykh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Shcherbatykh ( CPSO# 88370 )
Dr. J. Shcherbatykh ( CPSO# 93327 )

Business Address:
Suites 1 - 2 and 3 - 4
124 Charing Cross Street
Brantford ON  N3R 2J1
Phone Number: (519) 304-8550

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Business Address:
81 Wilson Street West
Suite 303
Ancaster ON  L9G 1N1
Phone Number: (289) 239-8537

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA ALEKSANDROVNA SHCHERBATYKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHCHERBATYKH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013