Shea, Philip Ernest Patrick (CPSO#: 22243)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip Shea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Derek Coull 393 Rymal Road W Suite 104 Hamilton, ON L9B 1V3
Date Received: 10 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017