Shehata, Sarwat Wadid Mosaad (CPSO#: 63285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northeast Cancer Centre
Radiation Oncology Department
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-6237
Fax: (705) 523-7329
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shehata Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shehata ( CPSO# 63285 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-6237


Corporation Name: Pearce, Andronowski and Want Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2015


Corporation Name: Want and Carlson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 4 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 29 May 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARWAT WADID MOSAAD SHEHATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEHATA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996