Sheikh, Gul Nawaz (CPSO#: 87428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Kashmiri, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Kashmir University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 863-2320
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

10350 Yonge St #002
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 237-5433
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. N. Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sheikh ( CPSO# 87428 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Ajax and Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUL NAWAZ SHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 13, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)