Shenassa, Hassan (CPSO#: 61304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 725-1870
Fax: (613) 725-1647
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Shenassa & S. Crooks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Shenassa ( CPSO# 61304 )
Dr. S. Crooks ( CPSO# 74970 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone Number: (613) 725-1870

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Trinidad and Tobago

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASSAN SHENASSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENASSA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1990