Shenfield, Carey Burton (CPSO#: 65985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Regional Cancer Centre
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4173
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. W. Mackillop ( CPSO# 32028 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. S. Thain ( CPSO# 72665 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: Shenfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shenfield ( CPSO# 64950 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
Emergency Room
75 Charles Street
Kingston ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 548-2333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAREY BURTON SHENFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENFIELD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009