Shenker, Robert Lee (CPSO#: 71370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Albert Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 3S2
Phone: (519) 746-1132
Fax: (519) 746-0316
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Shenker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shenker ( CPSO# 71370 )

Business Address:
50 Albert Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 3S2
Phone Number: (519) 746-1132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT LEE SHENKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2004