Shepherd, Susan Mary (CPSO#: 59712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Health Centre
410 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 867-3728
Fax: (416) 867-3726
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shepherd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 59712 )

Business Address:
St. Michaels Health Centre
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3728

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY SHEPHERD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPHERD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1989