Sheppard, Miranda Elizabeth (CPSO#: 86419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 963-3781
Fax: (519) 963-3779
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Miranda Sheppard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sheppard ( CPSO# 86419 )

Business Address:
307 - 460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone Number: (519) 963-3781

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRANDA ELIZABETH SHEPPARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPPARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009