Sheppard, Robert Reginald Benjamin (CPSO#: 33041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6453
Fax: (807) 684-5868
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert R. Sheppard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sheppard ( CPSO# 33041 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6467

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT REGINALD BENJAMIN SHEPPARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPPARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1982