Sheth, Hinal (CPSO#: 89113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Citrus Medical Centre
398 Royal York Road
Toronto ON  M8Y 2R5
Phone: (416) 800-6500 Ext. 1
Fax: 416-342-1790
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Citrus Medical Centre
2240 Lake Shore Blvd W
Unit 107
Toronto ON  M8V 0B1
Canada
Phone: 416-800-6500 Ext. 2
Fax: 416-342-1790
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

160 Horner Ave
Toronto ON  M8Z 4X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hinal Sheth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sheth ( CPSO# 89113 )

Business Address:
Suite 106
2240 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Toronto ON  M8V 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 800-6500

Business Address:
398 Royal York Road
Toronto ON  M8Y 2R5
Phone Number: (416) 800-6500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HINAL SHETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010