Sheth, Nikita Tej (CPSO#: 76525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 8452571 Ext. 5313
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nikita Sheth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sheth ( CPSO# 76525 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIKITA TEJ SHETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2003