Shetty, Niren (CPSO#: 82981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (416) 756-6024
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shetty Iyer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Iyer ( CPSO# 82479 )
Dr. N. Shetty ( CPSO# 82981 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7843

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIREN SHETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007