Shickh, Ali Mehdi (CPSO#: 58601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 697-8022
Fax: (905) 697-6218
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shickh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shickh ( CPSO# 58601 )

Business Address:
301 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 697-8022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI MEHDI SHICKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHICKH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1999