Shilletto, Derek William Nicholas (CPSO#: 63213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 1990

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 496-0488
Fax: (416) 496-9790
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Shilletto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shilletto ( CPSO# 63213 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 496-0488

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 29 May 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK WILLIAM NICHOLAS SHILLETTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHILLETTO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1990

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)