Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Shin, John Hyunsik (CPSO#: 63718)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 78
Suite 346
1800 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 5A7
Phone: (416) 491-0555
Fax: (416) 491-0556
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John H. Shin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 11 2015


Corporation Name: John H. Shin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shin ( CPSO# 63718 )

Business Address:
Suite 346
1800 Sheppard Avenue East
P.O. Box 78
Toronto ON  M2J 5A7
Phone Number: (416) 491-0555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2015
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2015
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., April 1, 2015, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John
            Hyunsik Shin:

                  (i)   Dr. Shin shall participate in and successfully complete an
                        educational program satisfactory to the College in Ethics, with a
                        report or reports to be provided to the College regarding Dr.
                        Shin's progress and compliance. Dr. Shin shall complete the next
                        available course and shall forthwith thereafter provide proof of
                        completion thereof to the College;
                  
                  (ii)  Dr. Shin will, at his own expense, retain an ophthalmologist
                        practice monitor approved by the College to review Dr. Shin's
                        Ontario Health Insurance Plan("OHIP") billings and the
                        corresponding patient charts to ensure his compliance with the
                        Health Insurance Act and who will sign an undertaking in the form
                        attached hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Practice Monitor");
                  
                  (iii) The Practice Monitor will review twenty-five (25) of Dr. Shin's
                        patient charts for which he has billed OHIP once every three (3)
                        months for a minimum of three (3) years. If Dr. Shin bills OHIP for
                        fewer than twenty-five (25) patients in any given three-month
                        period, the Practice Monitor will review all of the patient charts
                        for which Dr. Shin billed OHIP. In the event that Dr. Shin has
                        billed OHIP for fewer than 300 patients during the three-year
                        period of monitoring, the monitoring will continue until 300 charts
                        have been reviewed;
                  
                  (iv)  If a Practice Monitor who has given an undertaking in Schedule "A"
                        to this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its
                        terms, Dr. Shin shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice
                        of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a
                        similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and
                        ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time;
                  
                  (v)   If Dr. Shin is unable to obtain a Practice Monitor in accordance
                        with paragraphs 4(ii), 4(iii) and 4(iv) of this Order, he shall
                        cease to submit bills to OHIP until such time as he has done so;
                  
                  (vi)  Dr. Shin shall consent to the disclosure by his Practice Monitor to
                        the College, and by the College to his Practice Monitor, of all
                        information the Practice Monitor or the College deems necessary or
                        desirable in order to fulfill the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                        and to monitor Dr. Shin's compliance with this Order;
                  
                  (vii) For an indefinite period of time, Dr. Shin shall inform the College
                        of each and every location where he practises including, but not
                        limited to hospitals, clinics, and offices, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively, his "Practice Locations)"), within fifteen (15) days
                        of this Order, and shall inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within 15 days of commencing practice at that
                        location, for the purposes of monitoring his compliance with this
                        Order;  
                  
                  (viii)For an indefinite period of time, Dr. Shin shall submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice Locations
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring his compliance with this Order;
                  
                  (ix)  Dr. Shin shall consent to the monitoring of his OHIP billings and
                        cooperate with inspections of his practice and patient charts by
                        his Practice Monitor and College representatives for the purpose of
                        monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this
                        Order; and
                  
                  (x)   Dr. Shin shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with
                        implementing the terms of this Order.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Apr 2015
Summary:

  

 On April 1, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. John Hyunsik Shin committed an act 
 of professional misconduct in that:  he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
 suitability to practise; and, that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Shin admitted to the allegations. 
  
 On November 13, 2013, Dr. Shin pleaded guilty to the charge of fraud over $5,000 pursuant to 
 subsection 380(1) of the Criminal Code. It was alleged that, between January 1, 2006 and March 
 20, 2007, Dr. Shin “did by deceit, falsehood or other fraudulent means defraud the Ministry of 
 Health and Long Term Care of money exceeding $5,000 by billing the Ontario Health Insurance 
 Plan for services not rendered”. Dr. Shin admitted to the following in his guilty plea, among 
 other things: 
  
 (a) He billed the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) for uninsured eye examinations and 
    uninsured contact lens fittings; 
 (b) He did not perform contact lens fittings for any of his patients. His staff did the fittings; and 
 (c) He billed OHIP for 4,495 services from 2003-2007, the next closest ophthalmologist billed 
    for 966 services. 
     
 With respect to the contact lens fittings, Dr. Shin had a high volume of billings for the billing 
 code G424, which is an OHIP billing code reserved for patients who have at least one of the 
 medical conditions set out in s. 24(1) of Regulation 552 of the Health Insurance Act (the “HIA”). 
An investigation revealed that Dr. Shin did not provide contact lens fittings for any of his 
patients. A prescription was completed by Dr. Shin for the patient, and the staff did all contact 
lens fittings. The patients did not suffer from any of the conditions set out in the HIA, and thus 
were not insured for that service. Thirty-four patients confirmed they did not obtain a contact 
lens fitting from Dr. Shin and that they did not suffer from any of the conditions eligible for 
billing. 
 
With respect to the eye exams, Dr. Shin had a high volume of billings for the code A233, which 
is an OHIP billing code for ‘Specific assessment’.  An independent expert retained by the 
College determined that 222 out of 233 Dr. Shin’s records for the codes G424 and A233 
contained fraudulent billings. The total amount of Dr. Shin’s fraud was calculated on the basis of 
those records to be $43,176. Dr. Shin made restitution in the amount of $43,176 to the Ministry 
of Health and Long-Term Care prior to his sentencing hearing. 
 
On November 25, 2013, Dr. Shin was convicted in the Ontario Court of Justice of fraud 
exceeding $5,000 contrary to subsection 380(1) of the Criminal Code and was sentenced to: 
(a) An 8-month conditional sentence to be served in the community; 
(b) Provide a sample of his DNA for the national database; and 
(c) Following the sentence, 2 years of probation, including 125 hours of community service. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Shin's certificate of registration for a period of five (5) months, 
      commencing at 12:01 a.m. on May 1, 2015. 
              

-  The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Shin's 
   certificate of registration: 
   (i) Dr. Shin shall participate in and successfully complete an educational program 
   satisfactory to the College in Ethics, with a report or reports to be provided to the College 
   regarding Dr. Shin's progress and compliance. Dr. Shin shall complete the next available 
   course and shall forthwith thereafter provide proof of completion thereof to the College; 
   (ii) Dr. Shin will, at his own expense, retain an ophthalmologist practice monitor 
   approved by the College to review Dr. Shin's Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP") 
   billings and the corresponding patient charts to ensure his compliance with the Health 
   Insurance Act and who will sign an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Schedule 
   "A" (the "Practice Monitor"); 
   (iii) The Practice Monitor will review twenty-five (25) of Dr. Shin's patient charts for 
   which he has billed OHIP once every three (3) months for a minimum of three (3) years. 
   If Dr. Shin bills OHIP for fewer than twenty-five (25) patients in any given three-month 
   period, the Practice Monitor will review all of the patient charts for which Dr. Shin billed 
   OHIP. In the event that Dr. Shin has billed OHIP for fewer than 300 patients during the 
   three-year period of monitoring, the monitoring will continue until 300 charts have been 
   reviewed; 
   (iv) If a Practice Monitor who has given an undertaking in Schedule "A" to this Order is 
   unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Shin shall, within twenty (20) days 
   of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a 
   similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered 
   to the College within that time; 
   (v) If Dr. Shin is unable to obtain a Practice Monitor in accordance with paragraphs 4(ii), 
   4(iii) and 4(iv) of this Order, he shall cease to submit bills to OHIP until such time as he 
   has done so; 
   (vi) Dr. Shin shall consent to the disclosure by his Practice Monitor to the College, and 
   by the College to his Practice Monitor, of all information the Practice Monitor or the 
   College deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Practice Monitor's 
   undertaking and to monitor Dr. Shin's compliance with this Order; 
   (vii) For an indefinite period of time, Dr. Shin shall inform the College of each and every 
   location where he practises including, but not limited to hospitals, clinics, and offices, in 
   any jurisdiction (collectively, his "Practice Locations)"), within fifteen (15) days of this 
   Order, and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen 
   (15) days of commencing practice at that location, for the purposes of monitoring his 
   compliance with this Order; 
   (viii) For an indefinite period of time, Dr. Shin shall submit to, and not interfere with, 
   unannounced inspections of his Practice Locations and patient records by a College 
   representative for the purposes of monitoring his compliance with this Order; 
   (ix) Dr. Shin shall consent to the monitoring of his OHIP billings and cooperate with 
   inspections of his practice and patient charts by his Practice Monitor and College 
   representatives for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the 
   terms of this Order; and 
   (x) Dr. Shin shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the 
   terms of this Order. 
-  Dr. Shin appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
              

-  Dr. Shin pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460, within thirty (30) days of the 
  date of this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 1, 2015

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 10, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)