Shipley, James Henry (CPSO#: 51811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Dec 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shipley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shipley ( CPSO# 51811 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 20 Dec 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 20 Dec 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 20, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. James Henry Shipley,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Shipley to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of

                                          DR. JAMES SHIPLEY
                                          ("Dr. Shipley")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "clinical medicine" means the diagnosis, assessment, and treatment of
                  patients. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Shipley, certificate of registration number 51811, am a member of
                  the College.    

            (3)   I, Dr. Shipley, acknowledge that I have not practised medicine since June
                  27, 2014 for personal reasons.


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Shipley, undertake that I will not return to the practice of
                  clinical medicine until I have completed each of the following
                  pre-conditions: 

                  (a)   I have provided a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the
                        College of my intent to return to the practice of clinical
                        medicine; and
                  
                  (b)   I have provided the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada. 
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. Shipley, acknowledge that I do not have an active OHIP billing
                  number at this time, and I undertake to provide proof of same to the
                  College. 

            (6)   I, Dr. Shipley, undertake that in the event I wish to return to the
                  practice of clinical medicine, I will abide by the College's Policy on
                  "Re-entering Practice," a copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix
                  "A," even if the period of time during which I am not practising clinical
                  medicine will amount to less than three years.

            (7)   I, Dr. Shipley, acknowledge that I entered into a prior Undertaking with
                  the College dated July 31, 2012 regarding my emergency practice (the
                  "prior Undertaking"), and I undertake that, should I return to the
                  practice of clinical medicine, I will complete the remaining requirements
                  from the prior Undertaking through my compliance with the College's
                  Policy on "Re-entering Practice." 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (8)   I, Dr. Shipley, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Shipley, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Shipley, undertake to comply with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College or the Fitness to Practise
                  Committee of the College.

            (11)  I, Dr. Shipley, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Shipley, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Shipley, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Shipley has ceased to practise medicine for personal reasons at
                        this time and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any
                        clinical services. He has agreed to provide notice of his intent to
                        return to the clinical practice of medicine, and to abide by the
                        College's policy on "Re-entering Practice" should he do so.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Shipley, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Shipley, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Henry Shipley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 20, 2016:

Dr. Shipley has ceased to practise medicine for personal reasons at this time and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any clinical services. He has agreed to provide notice of his intent to return to the clinical practice of medicine, and to abide by the College’s policy on “Re-entering Practice” should he do so.