Shkrum, Michael James (CPSO#: 32342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
339 windermere rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36357
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael J. Shkrum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shkrum ( CPSO# 32342 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES SHKRUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHKRUM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1985