Shoemaker, Elisabeth Anne (CPSO#: 51813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 58
4319 Cove Road
Portland ON  K0G 1V0
Phone: (613) 272-3302
Fax: (613) 272-3024
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elisabeth Shoemaker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shoemaker ( CPSO# 51813 )

Business Address:
4319 Cove Road
P.O. Box 58
Portland ON  K0G 1V0
Phone Number: (613) 272-3302

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISABETH ANNE SHOEMAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOEMAKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1983