Shoham, Sheryl (CPSO#: 59400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sackler School of Medicine
NY American Program
Tel Aviv University
Ramat Aviv 69978
Israel
Phone: 972526116876
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sir William Osler Medical Centre
Etobicoke campus
101 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke
Toronto ON  H9V 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERYL SHOHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Oct 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1989