Shokr, Tarek (CPSO#: 111129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Oct 2016

Expiry Date:  27 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Erin Mills Medical Clinic
Unit E229A PO Box M
5100 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5M 4Z5
Phone: 9056072600
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Shokr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Shokr ( CPSO# 111129)

Business Address:
Erin Mills Medical Centre
Unit E229A
PO Box M
5100 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5M 4Z5
Phone Number: (905) 607-2600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Oct 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Tarek Shokr may practise family medicine at Erin Mills Medical Clinic
                  in  Mississauga,  Ontario,  while  under  supervision  coordinated  by  a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  automatically expires eighteen months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Shokr's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Shokr's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the  on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Shokr's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on October 28, 2016, and will expire on  or
                  before April 27, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.