Shore, Donna Ava (CPSO#: 55421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 721-6788
Fax: (613) 721-6789
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donna Shore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shore ( CPSO# 55421 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 721-6788

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA AVA SHORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHORE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991