Shouldice, Elizabeth Hollington (CPSO#: 87165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2600
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Perth and Smiths Falls
District Hospital
Great War Memorial Site
33 Drummond Street
Perth ON  K7H2K1
Canada
Phone: 6132671500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

2006 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 1A5
Canada
Phone: (613) 903-6006
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Shouldice Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shouldice ( CPSO# 87165 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carlten Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
22 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 14 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH HOLLINGTON SHOULDICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOULDICE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2008