Shukla, Avanish Kumar (CPSO#: 30442)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Lucknow, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. K. Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y8 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Ext. 1 www.GetMyRecord.ca
Date Received: 11 Nov 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Nov 2016