Shulakewych, Markian Oleh (CPSO#: 67997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: (613) 721-4706
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Markian Shulakewych Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shulakewych ( CPSO# 67997 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARKIAN OLEH SHULAKEWYCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHULAKEWYCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 1998 to 07 Nov 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2006